IL HB3722 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Allows the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives and the Minority Leader of the Senate to appoint one member each to an advisory committee that determines which homes contain windows or doors that cause offensive odors and are eligible for replacement pursuant to the Residential Sound Insulation Program. Effective immediately.
Title
RESIDENTIAL SOUND INSULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar [D] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] | Sen. Mike Porfirio [D] | Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0200 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 016-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-101-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |