IL HB3750 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, beginning on February 1, 2015, the Treasurer shall transfer each month from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund an amount equal to 10% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed under the Act during the preceding month (instead of: (i) beginning on February 1, 2015 and through January 31, 2025, an amount equal to the sum of 8% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed upon individuals, trusts, and estates, and 9.14% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on corporations; and (ii) beginning on February 1, 2025, an amount equal to the sum of 9.23% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed upon individuals, trusts, and estates, and 10% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on corporations).
Title
INC TX-LOCAL GOV DISTRIBUTIVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-11-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3750&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3750.htm |