IL HB3867 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Increases the maximum amount of the Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption from $3,500 to $5,000 and provides that the maximum amount must be increased each year by the lesser of (i) 2% or (ii) the percentage increase during the immediately prior taxable year in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for all items published by the United States Department of Labor, Bureau of Labor Statistics. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SR HOMESTEAD EXEMPT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3867&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3867.htm |