IL HB3886 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the regulation, licensing, possession, registration, and transportation of components and accessories for handguns by concealed carry licensees are exclusive powers and functions of the State. Provides that any ordinance or regulation, or portion thereof, enacted on or before the effective date of the amendatory Act that purports to impose regulations or restrictions on components and accessories for handguns in a manner inconsistent with the Act shall be invalid in its application to licensees under the Act on the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-PREEMPT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3886&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3886.htm |