IL HB3890 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 030-078-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 030-078-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any trailer sold in Illinois that is pulled by a motor vehicle which is not a truck tractor must have its identification number stamped into the steel frame on an area visible within 24 inches of the coupling and must have a metal identification tag affixed to the unit. Effective January 1, 2013.
Title
VEH CD-TRAILER ID NUMBERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 30 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 030-078-000 |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandy Cole |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2011-11-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-29 | House | First Reading |
2011-11-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |