IL HB3983 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Childhood Anaphylactic Policy Act. Requires the Department of Public Health, in consultation with the State Board of Education and the Department of Children and Family Services, to establish anaphylactic policies for school districts and day care centers. Requires the Department to create, distribute, and make available on its website informational materials regarding the policies. Contains requirements for the policies. Requires schools and day care centers to notify parents and guardians of the policies at least once each calendar year. Requires the policies to be forwarded to each school board of a school district, charter school, and day care center in the State within 6 months after the Act's effective date and to be implemented by those entities within 6 months after receiving the policies. Provides that the policies shall be updated at least once every 3 years. Contains other provisions. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
ANAPHYLACTIC POLICY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-12-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-12-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-12-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-12-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3983&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3983.htm |