IL HB4206 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 2:00 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 2:00 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Landlord and Tenant Act. Provides that if a landlord uses a third-party payment portal to collect rental payments from tenants and if a transaction fee or other charge is imposed through the portal on rental payments made by e-check or other means, then the landlord shall allow the tenant to make rental payments by delivering a paper check to the landlord or the landlord's business office or by means that do not require the tenant to pay the transaction fee or other charge.
Title
LANDLORD/TENANT-ADDITIONAL FEE
Sponsors
Rep. Hoan Huynh [D] | Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] | Rep. Gregg Johnson [D] | Rep. Norma Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-039-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 012-002-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2023-11-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-10-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |