IL HB4266 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Prisoner Review Board shall not release the names or addresses of any person on its victim registry to any other person except the victim, a law enforcement agency, or other victim notification system.
Title
CD CORR-VICTIM REGISTRY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0717 |
2014-07-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2014-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-04-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 014-000-000 |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-3-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |