IL HB4272 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Provides that a limitation upon the applicability of certain provisions in the Code concerning local school councils does not apply to specified schools. In provisions concerning the remediation and probation of attendance centers, deletes provisions regarding the actions that may be taken by the general superintendent if a school is placed on probation and fails to make adequate progress in correcting deficiencies. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-LOCAL SCHOOL COUNCILS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2024-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-12-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-2.4b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-8.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4272&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4272.htm |