IL HB4348 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Commission on Equity and Inclusion Act. Provides that the Commission shall supervise (rather than oversee) the implementation and effectiveness of supplier diversity training of the State procurement workforce (rather the implementation of diversity training of the State workforce). Effective immediately.
Title
COMM EQUITY&INCLUSION-TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-011-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 574 | 40-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |