IL HB4351 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Removes language providing that process may be served by a person who is licensed or registered as a private detective or by a registered employee of a private detective agency in counties with a population of less than 2,000,000 (and instead allows process to be served in such a manner statewide). Provides that, in a county of 3,000,000 or more, any person who is licensed or registered as a private detective under the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004 or by a registered employee of a private detective agency certified under that Act and hired to serve process shall remit $5 of each service fee to the county sheriff.
Title
CIV PRO-PROCESS SERVERS
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass [D] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |