IL HB4396 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 concerning bail. Provides that the incarceration credit does not apply to a person incarcerated for a felony offense who committed the offense when he or she was released on bond, on pretrial release, in pretrial detention, or serving a sentence of incarceration for a separate offense. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO-BAIL CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4396&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4396.htm |