IL HB4430 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit for certain small businesses in an amount equal to the lesser of (i) 10% of the property taxes paid by the qualified small business during the taxable year for eligible real property or (ii) $1,500. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-SMALL BUSINESS CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |