IL HB4431 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes language providing that the examination of an applicant for a driver's license or permit who is 75 years of age or older or, if the Secretary of State adopts rules to raise the age requirement for actual demonstrations, the examination of an applicant who has attained that increased age or is older shall include an actual demonstration of the applicant's ability to exercise ordinary and reasonable control of the operation of a motor vehicle. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
VEH CD-NO ROAD TEST OVER 75
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 008-001-001 |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-03-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4431&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4431.htm |