IL HB4439 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Agency Web Site Act. Provides that State agency web sites may not use persistent (instead of permanent) cookies or other tracking software except in specific circumstances. Repeals provisions establishing the Internet Privacy Task Force. Makes conforming changes.
Title
ST AGENCY WEBSITE COOKIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 177 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 177 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |