IL HB4476 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mold Remediation Registration Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall establish a public awareness campaign to assist the public in understanding the threat and importance of removing mold from indoor environments. Provides requirements for the Department to follow regarding the campaign. Defines terms. Provides that the Department must report, annually, to the Environment and Energy Committees of the House of Representatives and the Senate concerning the implementation of any federal regulations or State rules (instead of federal regulations) that establish scientific evidence concerning the health effects of mold and its byproducts on the training, certification, and licensing of parties providing mold remediation services. Provides that the Department shall (instead of may) adopt rules to implement a program establishing procedures for parties that provide mold remediation services to register with the State and provide evidence of an active third-party certification and evidence of financial responsibility (instead of only provide evidence of financial responsibility). Removes language exempting from the provisions of the Act persons licensed under the Structural Pest Control Act.
Title
MOLD REMEDIATION-AWARENESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 105 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 105 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 105 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 105 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 105 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 105 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4476&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4476.htm |