IL HB4495 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that an application for an identification card must include the applicant's county of residence. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Requires an application for a driver's permit or license to include the applicant's county of residence. Requires the Secretary of State to include an applicant's county of residence on a driver's license issued, renewed, or corrected beginning on January 1, 2025. Provides that a person who moved from a residence address listed on the person's application must notify the Driver Services Department in writing of the person's old and new residence addresses, including the county of the new residence.
Title
COUNTY RESIDENCE ON ID/LICENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |