IL HB4507 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Credit Services Organizations Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Credit Repair Organizations Act. Provides that the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation shall oversee the activities of credit repair organizations and compliance with the Act. Provides that a credit repair organization shall submit reports to the Secretary containing specified information. Provides that every credit repair organization shall maintain a surety bond or electronic surety bond in the principal sum of $100,000 issued by a bonding company authorized to do business in this State and approved by the Secretary. Provides that the bond shall run to the Secretary and shall be for the benefit of any consumer who incurs damages as a result of any violation of the Act or rules adopted under the Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning contracts between a buyer and a credit repair organization and registration of credit repair organizations. Inserts provisions concerning the transfer of records; rulemaking; regulatory assessment; evasion; examination and reports; violations; enforcement; confidential supervisory information; judicial review; buyer and a credit repair organization; registration of credit repair organizations; violations of the Act; remedies; and conflicts of law. Repeals provisions concerning construction of the Act and surety bonds. Provides that the Secretary may adopt rules necessary to administer the Act. Defines terms. Repeals provisions concerning surety bonds. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that any person who violates the Credit Repair Organizations Act commits an unlawful practice within the meaning of the Act. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
CREDIT REPAIR ORGANIZATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2EEEE | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 17.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 5.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 7.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 605 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 605 | 9.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4507&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4507.htm |