IL HB4559 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utility Act. Exempts a public utility with $300,000 or less of annual operating revenues using the Simplified Rate Case Procedures from the requirement that, when any public utility that provides water or sewer service proposes a general rate increase, the water or sewer public utility must notify its customers of their right to request a public forum. Effective immediately.
Title
WATER UTILITY-RATE-EXCEPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-012-000 |
2012-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2012 |
2012-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2012 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy; 012-000-000 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Energy |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Held in Energy |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-046-000 |
2012-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andr |
2012-02-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 018-003-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andr |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |