IL HB4581 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that if a student who is 18 years of age or older with no legal guardian is placed residentially outside of the school district in which the student's parent lives and the placement is funded by a State agency or through private insurance, then the resident district is the school district in which the parent lives. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SPEC ED-RESIDENT DIST
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock [D] | Rep. Mary Gill [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] |
Rep. Nabeela Syed [D] | Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-1.11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |