IL HB4589 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Hijacking and Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention and Insurance Verification Act. Eliminates the provision that provided for the repeal of the Act on January 1, 2025. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Includes "catalytic converter" in the definition of "essential parts". Amends the Recyclable Metal Purchase Registration Law. Excludes catalytic converter from the definition of "recyclable metals". Requires transactions involving a catalytic converter to include the identification number of the vehicle from which the catalytic converter was removed and the part number or other identifying number of the catalytic converter that was removed. Provides that, in a transaction involving a catalytic converter, the recyclable metal dealer must also require a copy of the certificate of title or registration showing the seller's ownership in the vehicle. Makes it unlawful for any person to purchase or otherwise acquire a used, detached catalytic converter or any nonferrous part thereof unless specified conditions are met. Provides that a used, detached catalytic converter does not include a catalytic converter that has been tested, certified, and labeled for reuse in accordance with the United States Environmental Protection Agency Clean Air Act. Defines terms. Makes technical changes.
Title
VEH CD-CATALYTIC CONVERTERS
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] | Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Matt Hanson [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 4005 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 1-110.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-115.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-401.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-402.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 325 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 325 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 325 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 325 | 4.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |