IL HB4617 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the One Day Rest In Seven Act. Deletes language providing that a violation of the Act is a petty offense. Adds language providing that an employer who violates any of the provisions of the Act is subject to a civil penalty of not less than $25 nor more than $100 for each affected employee for each day that the violation continues.
Title
ONE DAY REST IN SEVEN-PENALTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4617&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4617.htm |