IL HB4712 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Medicaid & Managed Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Medicaid & Managed Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the reimbursement rates in effect on the effective date of the amendatory Act for optometrist services shall be increased by 35%. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-OPTOMETRIST RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4712&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4712.htm |