IL HB4715 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 2:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 2:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. In provisions concerning the regulation of unmanned aircraft systems, provides that nothing in those provisions shall be construed to deny a unit of local government the right to adopt reasonable rules related to the use by a private party of airspace that is above ground level of public property owned or controlled by that unit of local government. Provides that the provisions apply to publicly owned or controlled property that is intended or permitted to be used for recreational or conservation purposes, including, but not limited to, parks, playgrounds, aquatic facilities, wildlife areas, or other recreational facilities. Provides that reasonable rules adopted pursuant to the provisions do not supersede any administrative rules adopted by the Department of Transportation or any federal laws, rules, or regulations. Effective immediately.
Title
UNMANNED AIRCRAFT REGULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] |
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
620 | 5 | 42.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |