IL HB4720 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the introduced bill with the following changes. Removes the definition of eligible applicant. Changes the definition of professional to an individual employed by a human service agency that contracts with or is grant-funded by a State agency for specified purposes. Removes the requirement of a qualified program to be in the human services field for the purpose of training and preparing students to be human service professionals. Changes references from a direct service professional to a human service professional or a professional. Removes as eligibility criteria being a United States citizen or eligible noncitizen and holding a degree from a qualified program. Requires an applicant to remain a full-time employee as a human service professional in the same community-based human service agency for at least 12 months after receiving the grant (instead of remain a full-time employee as a human service professional in a community-based human service agency at least 12 months after receiving the grant). Removes provisions concerning repayment of grant or stipend funds if the professional does not complete a required period of employment as a human service professional. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
HUMAN SERVICE PRO LOAN PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-31 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-31 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-03-02 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |