IL HB4720 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall provide the State Treasurer with the adjusted gross income of tax filers claiming dependents or the adoption tax credit. Provides that the State Treasurer may make supplementary deposits to children in financially insecure households if funds are deposited into the omnibus accounts. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the State Treasurer may make supplementary deposits of $50, or greater if designated by the State Treasurer rule, into the account of each beneficiary whose parent or legal guardian has an adjusted gross income below the Illinois median household income. Provides that the supplementary deposits shall be limited to one deposit per beneficiary.
Title
HIGHER ED SAVINGS-MEDICAID
Sponsors
Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock [D] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] |
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-038-004 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |