IL HB4738 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Private Business and Vocational Schools Act of 2012. Provides that the Board of Higher Education may issue a cease and desist order to any school operating without the required permit of approval and may impose a civil penalty. Sets forth various requirements for the cease and desist order and the penalty. Amends the Private College Act and the Academic Degree Act to make similar changes.
Title
BD HIGHER ED-CEASE AND DESIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 426 | 75.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 1005 | 14.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 1010 | 7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |