IL HB4739 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that in order to give providers more time to prepare for and implement changes to the Medicaid Mental Health Fee Schedule and to ensure that the quality and delivery of behavioral health care is not disrupted, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide an approved Medicaid Mental Health Fee Schedule to all behavioral health care providers no later than 45 days prior to the date such rate change takes effect, unless contrary to federal law and regulation. Requires the Department to obtain federal approval on any Medicaid Mental Health Fee Schedule by submitting all necessary documentation in a timely manner, including, but not limited to, submitting any required State Plan amendments to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Provides that if the Department is unable to provide 45 days' notice prior to the date such rate change takes effect due to external circumstances beyond the Department's control, the Department must provide a reasonable amount of notice. Provides that nothing in the amendatory Act shall be construed as a requirement to delay or prohibit implementation of rate changes that impact enrollee benefits as determined in the sole discretion of the Department.
Title
DHFS-MENTAL HLTH FEE SCHEDULE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |