IL HB4781 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Pending: House Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Pending: House Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Kinship in Demand (KIND) Act. Provides that the KIND Act creates the statutory vision and authority for the Department of Children and Family Services to execute a kin-first approach to service delivery and directs the juvenile courts to provide necessary oversight of the Department's obligations to maintain family connections and promote equitable opportunities for youth and families to thrive with relational permanence. Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Contains provisions concerning Department rules on relative, kinship, and licensed foster care; grants to subsidized guardians of hard-to-place children; a requirement on the Department to make reasonable efforts to place a child with a relative; documentation of the Department's reasons for failing to secure a relative placement; foster care maintenance payments for relatives who qualify for certification as a kinship caregiver home; subsidized guardianship support services for children and their guardians; certification and background checks on relative caregivers; annual reports regarding relative and kinship care placements; performance audits; and other matters. Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Requires the Department to adopt standards for certifying kinship caregiver family homes that are different from licensing standards used for non-relative foster family homes. Contains provisions concerning background screenings of prospective kinship caregivers; a requirement that the Department assist relatives and prospective kinship caregivers with completing the steps required for approval as a kinship caregiver home; orientation activities for prospective kinship caregivers; Guardianship Assistance Program payments and services for relative caregivers; and other matters. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes changes to provisions concerning "best interest" determinations; emergency placement of a minor with a willing relative pending a temporary custody hearing; court assessments on the Department's effort to place a minor with a relative; court ordered family-finding efforts; required notification to a minor's located relatives that the minor has been removed from the custody of the minor's parents; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-KINSHIP IN DEMAND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; |
2024-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 004-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-02 | House | To Foster Care Placement Subcommittee |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |