IL HB4804 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Allows a public water distribution entity to use contact information in its possession that it obtained before an unplanned disruption event in a public water supply in order to inform its customers of the unplanned disruption event, regardless of whether consent is expressly given to use the information for that purpose. Defines "unplanned disruption event in a public water supply".
Title
UNPLANNED WATER SUPPLY DISRUPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 021-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 023-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 19.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |