IL HB4835 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act, the State Employee Indemnification Act, the Illinois Identification Card Act, the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Peace Officer Fire Investigation Act, the Illinois Police Training Act, the Uniform Crime Reporting Act, the Police and Community Relations Improvement Act, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the Illinois Insurance Code, the Child Care Act of 1969, the Liquor Control Act of 1934, the Suicide Prevention, Education, and Treatment Act, the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act, the Alternate Fuels Act, the Burn Injury Reporting Act, the Illinois Public Health and Safety Animal Population Control Act, the Illinois Highway Code, the Toll Highway Act, the Roadside Memorial Act, the Illinois Vehicle Code, the Child Passenger Protection Act, the Renter's Financial Responsibility and Protection Act, the Transportation Network Providers Act, the Criminal Code of 2012, the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963, the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act, the Unified Code of Corrections, the Cannabis and Controlled Substances Tort Claims Act, the Crime Victims Compensation Act, and the Automotive Collision Repair Act. Replaces the term "accident", in relation to automobiles, motor vehicles, and traffic accidents, with the term "crash". Effective immediately.
Title
WORD CHANGE: ACCIDENT TO CRASH
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] |
Rep. John Cabello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4835&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4835.htm |