IL HB4883 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of Natural Resources, on behalf of the State of Illinois, to execute and deliver a quit claim deed to the Forest Preserve District of Will County to real property located in Will County for and in consideration of $1 paid to the Department. Effective immediately.
Title
DNR LAND TRANSFER-WILL COUNTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |