IL HB4928 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Designates the twenty-seventh day of June of each year as National PTSD Awareness Day to be observed throughout the State as a day of awareness and recognition of how post-traumatic stress disorder affects the lives of those impacted by it.
Title
NATIONAL PTSD AWARENESS DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton |