IL HB4959 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Adds members to the task force. Sets forth additional requirements for the strategic plan prepared by the task force. Provides that the task force shall submit its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly no later than July 1, 2026 (rather than December 31, 2027). Provides that appropriations for the task force may be used to support operational expenses of the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, including entering into a contract with a third-party provider for administrative support. Provides that the Director of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may, after issuing a request for proposals, designate a third-party provider to help facilitate task force meetings, compile information, and prepare the strategic plan. Repeals the provision on January 1, 2027 (rather than July 1, 2028). Makes other changes.
Title
CREATIVE ECONOMY TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-008-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |