IL HB4999 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Right to Privacy in the Workplace Act. Makes it unlawful for an employer or prospective employer to request or require an employee or applicant to authenticate or access a personal online account in the presence of the employer, to request or require that an employee or applicant invite the employer to join a group affiliated with any personal online account of the employee or applicant, or join an online account established by the employer. Prohibits retaliation against an employee or applicant. Defines terms.
Title
WORK PRIVACY SOCIAL MEDIA
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0610 |
2016-07-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 4, 2016 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001 |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 55 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |