IL HB5053 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no person shall gather in a public street, commercial parking lot, or any other area open to the public for the purpose of street racing or a street side show. Provides that a vehicle used in street racing or a street side show or used to interfere with the flow of traffic to facilitate street racing or a street side show is subject to forfeiture. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
VEH CD-STREET RACING/SIDESHOWS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 36-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5053&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5053.htm |