IL HB5241 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Deletes provisions requiring owners of underground storage tanks containing hazardous waste to register the tanks with the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency and provide the Agency with information concerning the contents of the tanks. Deletes a provision requiring the owners of registered tanks to notify the Agency of any change in registration information or of the removal the tank from service.
Title
EPA-UST-REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 023-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 22.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |