IL HB5247 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Day and Temporary Labor Services Act. Provides that a third party client is required to pay wages and related payroll taxes to a licensed day and temporary labor service agency for services performed by the day or temporary laborer for the third party client according to payment terms outlined on invoices, service agreements, or stated terms provided by the day and temporary labor service agency. Provides that a third party client who fails to comply is subject to the penalties provided in the Act. Provides that a day and temporary labor service agency aggrieved by a violation of the Act or any rule adopted under the Act by a third party client may file suit in circuit court of Illinois, in the county where the alleged offense occurred or where the day and temporary labor service agency which is party to the action is located, after a review by the Department of Labor of the alleged violation of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
DAY & TEMP LABOR-VIOLATIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Maria Berrios [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Susana Mendoza [D] |
Rep. Michael Tryon [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1185 | |
2010-07-22 | Effective Date July 22, 2010 | |
2010-07-22 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Do Pass Labor; 009-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Labor | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading | |
2010-03-23 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-23 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-18 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-03-05 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-05 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-24 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 024-000-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-02-16 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Labor Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana A. Mendoza |