IL HB5266 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a policeman who applies for disability benefits under the Article and has been denied reinstatement as a policeman by his or her employer because of a physical or mental incapacity shall be presumed to be disabled as that term is used in the Article. Provides that no policeman who otherwise meets the requirements for a disability benefit shall be denied a disability benefit unless and until the policeman's employer reinstates him or her as a policeman or offers him or her a limited-duty position. Provides that the changes apply retroactively to January 1, 2023. Provides that any policeman who has been denied a disability benefit without an offer of reinstatement or a limited-duty position after January 1, 2023 shall be entitled to retroactive disability benefits. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI POLICE-DISABILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 5-156.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |