IL HB5288 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of 100 Club of Illinois decals. Provides that the fee for original issuance of the 100 Club of Illinois decals shall be $45 with $30 to the 100 Club of Illinois Fund, a special fund created in the State treasury, and $15 to the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that the fee for renewal of the 100 Club of Illinois decals shall be $27 with $25 to the 100 Club of Illinois Fund and $2 to the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that all money in the 100 Club of Illinois Fund shall be paid as grants to the 100 Club of Illinois for the purpose of giving financial support to children and spouses of first responders killed in the line of duty and mental health resources for active duty first responders.
Title
VEH CD-100 CLUB SPECIAL PLATES
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Kelly [D] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Mary Gill [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] |
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.1015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |