IL HB5293 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Deletes provisions limiting adult dental services to emergencies and requiring the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to recognize certain conditions as dental emergencies. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-ADULT DENTAL SRVCS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5293&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5293.htm |