IL HB5301 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Coordinate System Act of 2024. Creates the Illinois Coordinate System Committee. Provides that the Committee shall create, review, and revise the Guide to the Illinois Coordinate System. Requires the Committee to meet at the call of any designated member of the Committee. Requires the Committee to adopt an organizational structure as necessary for the fulfillment of its purpose. Specifies the members required to form the Committee. Requires the Committee to engage with interested stakeholders throughout the State representing local, regional, State, and federal agencies, professional associations, academic institutions, and private sector companies, enterprises, and businesses. Sets forth provisions concerning the purpose of the Act, definitions, and the Guide to the Illinois Coordinate System. Repeals the Illinois Coordinate System Act.
Title
ILLINOIS COORDINATE SYSTEM ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 225 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |