IL HB5325 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Requires registration stickers issued as evidence of renewed registration issued by the Secretary of State to be displayed on the upper right corner of the rear registration plate or in a manner otherwise provided by the Secretary. Provides that registration stickers issued to truck-tractors shall be displayed on the upper right corner of the front registration plate or in a manner otherwise provided by the Secretary. Makes changes to other provisions concerning the definitions of "low-speed gas bicycle" and "pedestrian", the removal or towing of motor vehicles, antique vehicles and expanded-use antique vehicles, spot lamps and auxiliary driving lamps, stop and yield signs, crash notifications, police reporting of motor vehicle crash investigations, signal lamps and signal devices, use of head lamps and auxiliary driving lamps, when lighted lamps or required, street racing, duty to give information and render aid, operation of motorcycle and similar vehicles, fees for furnishing copies, overtaking on the right, and police escort fees.
Title
VEH CD-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-140.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 1-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1403.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-407 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-416 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 15-312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-413 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 4-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |