IL HB5349 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 4:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 4:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that whenever the Department of Transportation enters into an agreement with any State or State agency, any public or private entity or quasi-public entity for the lease, rental, or use of locomotives, passenger railcars, and other rolling stock equipment or accessions, the Department may deposit such receipts into a separate escrow account. Allows funds in an escrow account holding lease payments, use fees, or rental payments to be withdrawn by the Department with the consent of the Midwest Fleet Pool Board, and deposited into the High-Speed Rolling Stock Fund. Provides that at the end of the term of an escrow account holding lease payments, use fees, or rental payments, the remaining balance shall be deposited in the High-Speed Rail Rolling Stock Fund. Provides that whenever the Department enters into an agreement with any carrier, state or state agency, any public or private entity, or quasi-public entity for costs related to procurement and maintenance of locomotives, passenger railcars, and other rolling stock equipment or accessions, the Department shall deposit such receipts into the High-Speed Rolling Stock Fund. Provides that the Department may make transfers or payments into the High-Speed Rail Rolling Stock Fund for the State's share of the costs related to locomotives, passenger railcars, and other rolling stock equipment.
Title
HIGH SPEED RAIL STOCK FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-440 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2705 | 49.25h | Amended Code | Citation Text |