IL HB5473 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires an individual or entity proposing to provide or providing specified election services to the State (an election infrastructure vendor) to be approved by the State Board of Elections and to disclose any owners or shareholders with a 5% or greater interest or share in the company. Requires the election infrastructure vendor to report any known or suspected security incidents involving election systems to the local election authority and the Board no later than 10 days after the known or suspected incident. Provides that an election infrastructure vendor that fails to seek approval or fails to report an incident shall be subject to a penalty of not more than $10,000 for the first offense and not more than $20,000 for the second or subsequent offense to be paid to the State Board of Elections. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECT CD-INFRASTRUCTURE VENDOR
Sponsors
Sen. John Connor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5473&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5473.htm |