IL HB5501 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compulsory Attendance Article of the School Code. Provides that any child who is (i) 17 years of age or older or (ii) projected to graduate from a high school at the completion of the current school year shall be excused from attendance for no more than one-half of each school day in order to participate in an unpaid apprenticeship program. Provides that the student shall be excused from any mandatory school events during the school day.
Title
SCH CD-ABSENCE-APPRENTICESHIP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5501&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5501.htm |