IL HB5523 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Prevention of Gender-Based Discrimination in Service Industries Act. Prohibits a service business from discriminating on the basis of gender. Defines "service business" as a commercial enterprise that focuses on providing various services to customers and has no tangible, physical characteristics or products. This includes, but is not limited to, hairstylists, barbers, tailors, dry cleaners, and laundries. Provides that nothing in the Act prohibits price differences based specifically upon the amount of time, difficulty, or cost of providing the services. Requires these service businesses (tailors or businesses providing aftermarket clothing alterations, barbershops or hair salons, dry cleaners and laundries providing services to individuals) to post a notice that states they don't discriminate on prices charged for services of similar or like kind on the basis of the person's gender and that a complete price list is available upon request. Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act to provide that a person who violates the Prevention of Gender-Based Discrimination in Service Industries Act commits a civil rights violation within the meaning of the Illinois Human Rights Act, except as otherwise specified.
Title
GENDER DISCRIM-SERVICE INDUST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-04-18 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-004-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 6-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |