IL HB5550 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Summary of Rights for Safer Homes Act. Requires the Department of Human Rights to create a summary form advising tenants who have suffered domestic violence or sexual violence of the rights that they have under Illinois law that provide protection in their ability to have safe housing. Requires landlords to attach a copy of the summary as the first page of any written residential lease entered into with a tenant.
Title
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE-REMEDIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Housing; 017-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing |
2024-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 017-000-000 |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |