IL HB5574 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that, if DuPage County has adopted and implemented a road improvement impact fee by ordinance or resolution and repeals the ordinance or resolution, the collected fees, along with any accrued interest, in the existing impact fee accounts shall be transferred to a transportation account to be used for capacity-related improvements. Valid impact fee refunds shall be processed in accordance with the procedures set forth in the repealed ordinance or resolution.
Title
HWY CD-IMPACT FEE-REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-003-000 |
2024-03-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |