IL HB5607 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to conduct a study, subject to appropriations, of Illinois' disease response preparedness, in particular studying the State's preparedness against the Coronavirus. At the request of the Department, requires other State agencies, in particular the Illinois Emergency Management Agency, to support the Department's efforts. Provides that the study shall include specified information. Provides that a report of the Department's findings and any recommendations shall be submitted to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-CORONAVIRUS STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2020-03-17HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-258New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback